TX HB5202 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-11 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-11 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a central database containing information about offenders who have committed certain violent offenses.
Title
Relating to a central database containing information about offenders who have committed certain violent offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Victoria Neave Criado [D] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] |
Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D] | Sen. John Whitmire [D] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1308 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1308 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-11 | Effective immediately | |
2023-06-11 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-24 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1308 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF