TX HB52 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the penalty for the offense of illegal voting; increasing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the penalty for the offense of illegal voting; increasing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Elections |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB166 (Similar To) 2023-02-22 - Co-author authorized
SB166 (Similar To) 2023-02-22 - Co-author authorized
HB1243 (Same As) 2023-06-13 - Effective on 9/1/23
HB1735 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Elections
SB166 (Similar To) 2023-02-22 - Co-author authorized
HB1243 (Same As) 2023-06-13 - Effective on 9/1/23
HB1735 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Elections
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB52 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB00052I.htm |