TX HB5136 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of a county hotel occupancy tax to certain recreational vehicle parks and campgrounds in certain counties and the use of revenue from that tax.
Title
Relating to the applicability of a county hotel occupancy tax to certain recreational vehicle parks and campgrounds in certain counties and the use of revenue from that tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-14 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |