TX HB492 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the period during which an employee may file a claim for unpaid wages with the Texas Workforce Commission.
Title
Relating to the period during which an employee may file a claim for unpaid wages with the Texas Workforce Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-26 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2015-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Filed |