TX HB4771 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of tenant legal services offices by local governments to assist low-income residential tenants in eviction cases and in cases involving discrimination based on the tenants' disabilities.
Title
Relating to the creation of tenant legal services offices by local governments to assist low-income residential tenants in eviction cases and in cases involving discrimination based on the tenants' disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Salman Bhojani [D] | Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D] | Rep. Jolanda Jones [D] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] |
Rep. Stan Lambert [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1581 (Y: 107 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#1481 (Y: 69 N: 75 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-10 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#1481 (Y: 69 N: 75 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | House | Record vote RV#1581 |
2023-05-12 | House | Passed |
2023-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-11 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2023-05-11 | House | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration |
2023-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1481 |
2023-05-10 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2023-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2023-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Disabilities, Persons with
DISCRIMINATION
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES
Lawyers
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Disabilities, Persons with
DISCRIMINATION
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES
Lawyers
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant