TX HB4769 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on April 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Lake View Management and Development District; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting certain powers relating to navigation improvements; and granting powers of a road district.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Lake View Management and Development District; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting certain powers relating to navigation improvements; and granting powers of a road district.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-05-15 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-01 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-30 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-08 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-04-08 | Read first time | |
2009-04-07 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-04-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2503 (Same As) 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
Subjects
LAKE VIEW MANAGEMENT & DEVELOPMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports