TX HB4752 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the territory of the Barrett Management District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the territory of the Barrett Management District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1036 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1036
2019-05-07HousePassed
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-01HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-24HousePosting rule suspended
2019-04-23HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2019-04-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback