TX HB473 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the employment of certain peace officers, detention officers, county jailers, or firefighters who are injured in the course and scope of duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the employment of certain peace officers, detention officers, county jailers, or firefighters who are injured in the course and scope of duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#467 (Y: 108 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-12SenateRead first time
2017-04-27SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HousePassed
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-25HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2016-11-30HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback