TX HB4673 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Chambers County Municipal Utility District No. 3; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Chambers County Municipal Utility District No. 3; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1788 (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#742 (Y: 116 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#742 (Y: 116 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House discharges conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1788 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | House discharges conferees |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-22 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-22 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-22 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-30 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#742 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-24 | House | Amended 1-Bailes |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-04-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-27 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2540 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Subjects
CHAMBERS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 3
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility