TX HB464 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the preparation by the Legislative Budget Board of a dynamic fiscal impact statement for certain bills and joint resolutions affecting taxes and fees.
Title
Relating to the preparation by the Legislative Budget Board of a dynamic fiscal impact statement for certain bills and joint resolutions affecting taxes and fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Brown [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Sen. Kenneth Paxton [R] | Rep. Ralph Sheffield [R] | Sen. Larry Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-30 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-25 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-23 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-18 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-14 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amended | |
2009-05-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time | |
2008-12-22 | Filed |
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Legislature
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Legislature
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--General