TX HB4585 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the election of members of the board of directors of the Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17.
Title
Relating to the election of members of the board of directors of the Travis County Water Control and Improvement District No. 17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-19 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-22 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-22 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-03-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2148 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Left pending in committee
SB2148 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Left pending in committee
SB2148 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
TRAVIS COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 17
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
TRAVIS COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 17