TX HB4549 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the criminal jurisdiction of the supreme court and the abolishment of the court of criminal appeals.
Title
Relating to the criminal jurisdiction of the supreme court and the abolishment of the court of criminal appeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1993 (Same As) 2009-03-24 - Referred to Jurisprudence