TX HB4429 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duty of a school district to enter into an ad valorem tax abatement agreement under the Property Redevelopment and Tax Abatement Act for certain property.
Title
Relating to the duty of a school district to enter into an ad valorem tax abatement agreement under the Property Redevelopment and Tax Abatement Act for certain property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1650 (Y: 97 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1575 (Y: 104 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1575 (Y: 104 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | House | Record vote RV#1650 |
2023-05-12 | House | Passed |
2023-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#1575 |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2153 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB2153 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB2153 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Energy
Energy--General
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--School District
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Natural Gas
Energy--General
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--School District
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Natural Gas