TX HB4403 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an agreement between a school district and public institution of higher education to provide a dual credit program to high school students enrolled in the district.
Title
Relating to an agreement between a school district and public institution of higher education to provide a dual credit program to high school students enrolled in the district.
Sponsors
Rep. John Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1277 |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1277 (Same As) 2021-05-30 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts