TX HB4357 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the authority of a justice or municipal court over certain juvenile offenders and their parents.
Title
Relating to the authority of a justice or municipal court over certain juvenile offenders and their parents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Corrections | |
2009-03-25 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Justice
Courts--Municipal
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Courts--Justice
Courts--Municipal
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice