TX HB4348 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Vision East Municipal Utility District No. 1; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Vision East Municipal Utility District No. 1; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2017-05-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-08 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-05-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
VISION EAST MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
VISION EAST MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB4348 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB04348I.htm |