TX HB4343 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health benefit plan preauthorization requirements for certain health care services and the direction of utilization review by physicians.
Title
Relating to health benefit plan preauthorization requirements for certain health care services and the direction of utilization review by physicians.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2023-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health Care Providers
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS