TX HB4318 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the River Ranch Municipal Utility District of Liberty County and the Riverside Municipal Utility District of Liberty County; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the River Ranch Municipal Utility District of Liberty County and the Riverside Municipal Utility District of Liberty County; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-19 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-05 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2017-05-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2017-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-07 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-04-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
RIVER RANCH MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT OF LIBERTY COUNTY
RIVERSIDE MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT OF LIBERTY COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
RIVERSIDE MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT OF LIBERTY COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility