TX HB4279 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to credit agreements executed in connection with the issuance of obligations for certain public improvements.
Title
Relating to credit agreements executed in connection with the issuance of obligations for certain public improvements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | |
2009-05-05 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2009-05-05 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-23 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Financial
Financial--General
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
City Government--General
Financial
Financial--General
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources