TX HB4231 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the conveyancing or transfer in this state of water imported into this state from a source located outside this state.
Title
Relating to the conveyancing or transfer in this state of water imported into this state from a source located outside this state.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Branch [R] | Rep. William Callegari [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] |
Rep. Allan Ritter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-21 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Passed | |
2009-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-29 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-29 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-29 | Record vote | |
2009-04-29 | Passed | |
2009-04-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-28 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-28 | Amended | |
2009-04-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |