TX HB4228 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to child support enforcement.
Title
Relating to child support enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Jackson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB865 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date