TX HB4140 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the instructional materials and technology allotment, open education resource instructional materials, and the State Board of Education long-range technology plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the instructional materials and technology allotment, open education resource instructional materials, and the State Board of Education long-range technology plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-31HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-31HouseRead first time
2017-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback