TX HB4106 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution and punishment of the offense of intoxication assault.
Title
Relating to the prosecution and punishment of the offense of intoxication assault.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Bell [R] | Rep. William Zedler [R] | Rep. Leo Pacheco [D] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] |
Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-26 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4106 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04106I.htm |