TX HB4105 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 89-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance, enforcement, and recognition of marriage licenses and declarations of informal marriage.
Title
Relating to the issuance, enforcement, and recognition of marriage licenses and declarations of informal marriage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
MARRIAGE LICENSES
PRESERVATION OF SOVEREIGNTY & MARRIAGE ACT
SAME-SEX MARRIAGE
Family--Marriage Relationship
MARRIAGE LICENSES
PRESERVATION OF SOVEREIGNTY & MARRIAGE ACT
SAME-SEX MARRIAGE