TX HB4075 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the participation of the medical school at Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center at El Paso in the Joint Admission Medical Program.
Title
Relating to the participation of the medical school at Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center at El Paso in the Joint Admission Medical Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB201 (Same As) 2009-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--State Coordination
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER AT EL PASO
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--State Coordination
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER AT EL PASO