TX HB4038 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the definition of "qualifying job" for purposes of certification by the comptroller of public accounts as a qualifying data center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the definition of "qualifying job" for purposes of certification by the comptroller of public accounts as a qualifying data center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective immediately
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Finance
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-20HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-03HouseReferred to Government Transparency & Operation
2017-04-03HouseRead first time
2017-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback