TX HB4029 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1828 (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-12 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-20 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
City Government
City Government--Finance
Coastal Affairs & Beaches
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
City Government
City Government--Finance
Coastal Affairs & Beaches
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy