TX HB4009 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the provision of services to certain persons involved in, and the prosecution, punishment, and prevention of, offenses involving trafficking of persons or certain forced or sex-based labor or services, and to law enforcement training related to offenses involving that trafficking.
Title
Relating to the provision of services to certain persons involved in, and the prosecution, punishment, and prevention of, offenses involving trafficking of persons or certain forced or sex-based labor or services, and to law enforcement training related to offenses involving that trafficking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | Passed | |
2009-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-23 | Amended | |
2009-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-18 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-18 | Read first time | |
2009-05-15 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-14 | Record vote | |
2009-05-14 | Passed | |
2009-05-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-13 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-13 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-12 | Postponed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
HUMAN TRAFFICKING