TX HB4003 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board concerning a shortage of primary care physicians in this state.
Title
Relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board concerning a shortage of primary care physicians in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#988 (Y: 118 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#948 (Y: 114 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#948 (Y: 114 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#988 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#948 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Rural
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Rural
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS