TX HB4 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-1)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-31 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the calculation of the ad valorem rollback tax rate of a taxing unit and voter approval of a proposed tax rate that exceeds the rollback tax rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the calculation of the ad valorem rollback tax rate of a taxing unit and voter approval of a proposed tax rate that exceeds the rollback tax rate.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-28HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-07-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-07-28HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-07-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-07-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback