TX HB4 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prekindergarten, including a high quality prekindergarten grant program provided by public school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prekindergarten, including a high quality prekindergarten grant program provided by public school districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - House - HB 4Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - HB 4Third Reading House (Y: 128 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - HB 4Third Reading House (Y: 129 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 21 by Martinez Fischer (Y: 66 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-04-08 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 19 by Bohac (Y: 103 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 12 by González, Mary (Y: 97 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Fallon (Y: 123 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-28 Effective immediately
2015-05-28 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-21HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2015-05-21HouseRecord vote
2015-05-21HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2015-05-11HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-11HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2015-05-07HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2015-05-07SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07SenateRecord vote
2015-05-07SenatePassed
2015-05-07SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-07SenateRecord vote
2015-05-07SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-07SenateRecord vote
2015-05-07SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2015-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07SenateAmended
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07SenateAmended
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07SenateAmended
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateAmendment withdrawn
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateAmendment withdrawn
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07SenateAmended
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07SenateAmended
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateAmendment withdrawn
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateAmendment withdrawn
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07SenateAmended
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateAmendment withdrawn
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07SenateAmended
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateRecord vote
2015-05-07SenateAmended
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateRecord vote
2015-05-07SenateAmended
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateRecord vote
2015-05-07SenateAmended
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateRecord vote
2015-05-07SenateAmended
2015-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-07SenateRead 2nd time
2015-05-07SenateRecord vote
2015-05-07SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-07SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2015-05-06SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2015-05-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-05SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-04-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-04-23SenateReferred to Education
2015-04-23SenateRead first time
2015-04-13SenateReceived from the House
2015-04-10HouseReported engrossed
2015-04-09HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-09HouseRecord vote
2015-04-09HousePassed
2015-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-08HouseRecord vote
2015-04-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-04-08HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-04-08HouseAmendment adopted as amended
2015-04-08HouseAmendment amended
2015-04-08HouseAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-08HouseAmendment adopted as amended
2015-04-08HouseAmendment amended
2015-04-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-08HouseRecord vote
2015-04-08HouseMotion to table fails
2015-04-08HouseAmendment to amendment offered
2015-04-08HouseAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-08HouseRecord vote
2015-04-08HouseAmendment tabled
2015-04-08HouseAmended
2015-04-08HouseAmendment adopted as amended
2015-04-08HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2015-04-08HouseAmendment amended
2015-04-08HouseAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-08HouseAmendment as amended withdrawn
2015-04-08HouseAmendment amended
2015-04-08HouseAmendment amended
2015-04-08HouseAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-08HouseRecord vote
2015-04-08HouseAmendment tabled
2015-04-08HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2015-04-08HouseAmended
2015-04-08HouseAmended
2015-04-08HouseAmended
2015-04-08HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-04-08HouseAmended
2015-04-08HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2015-04-08HouseAmended
2015-04-08HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-04-08HouseAmendment to amendment withdrawn
2015-04-08HouseAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-08HouseAmended
2015-04-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-08HouseRecord vote
2015-04-08HouseAmendment tabled
2015-04-08HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2015-04-08HouseAmended
2015-04-08HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2015-04-08HousePoint of order overruled
2015-04-08HousePoint of order overruled
2015-04-08HousePoint of order overruled
2015-04-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-04-08HousePostponed
2015-04-08HousePoint of order withdrawn
2015-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-08HousePlaced on Emergency Calendar
2015-04-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-03-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-03-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-03-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Public Education
2015-02-26HouseRead first time
2015-02-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB4
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00004I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00004H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00004E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00004S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00004F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB4&RcdVtNo=174&Ch=H&Dt=04/08/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB4&RcdVtNo=175&Ch=H&Dt=04/08/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB4&RcdVtNo=176&Ch=H&Dt=04/08/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB4&RcdVtNo=177&Ch=H&Dt=04/08/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB4&RcdVtNo=178&Ch=H&Dt=04/08/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB4&RcdVtNo=183&Ch=H&Dt=04/09/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB4&RcdVtNo=1266&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2015

Bill Comments

feedback