TX HB4 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on January 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to eminent domain, including certain limitations, procedures, and standards relating to the use of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to eminent domain, including certain limitations, procedures, and standards relating to the use of eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2009-01-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB533 (Same As) 2009-03-30 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CONDEMNATION
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Property Interests--Real Property
CONDEMNATION
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Property Interests--Real Property