TX HB3978 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the offenses of sexual assault and aggravated sexual assault.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the offenses of sexual assault and aggravated sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Alcoholism & Drug Abuse
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3978 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03978I.htm |