TX HB3976 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to civil enforcement of an order of restitution for a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to civil enforcement of an order of restitution for a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Crime Victims Compensation
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Crime Victims Compensation
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3976 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03976I.htm |