TX HB3973 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study on abandoned oil and gas wells in this state and the use of the oil and gas regulation and cleanup fund.
Title
Relating to a study on abandoned oil and gas wells in this state and the use of the oil and gas regulation and cleanup fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1737 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#547 (Y: 108 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#547 (Y: 108 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House discharges conferees-reported |
2021-05-30 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-30 | House | Record vote RV#1737 |
2021-05-30 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-30 | House | House discharges conferees |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | House | House requests conference committee |
2021-05-28 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#547 |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Interim Studies
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Interim Studies
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control