TX HB3956 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a privilege from disclosure to governmental units for certain evidence concerning sermons delivered by a religious leader.
Title
Relating to a privilege from disclosure to governmental units for certain evidence concerning sermons delivered by a religious leader.
Sponsors
Rep. Charlie Geren [R] | Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. John Kuempel [R] |
Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Rep. John Frullo [R] | Rep. John Wray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-05 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Open Records
Political Subdivisions
Religion
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
City Government--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Open Records
Political Subdivisions
Religion
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions