TX HB3952 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the jurisdiction of courts in cases of forcible entry and detainer and forcible detainer.
Title
Relating to the jurisdiction of courts in cases of forcible entry and detainer and forcible detainer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed |