TX HB3903 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain political contributions by judicial candidates and officeholders and certain political committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain political contributions by judicial candidates and officeholders and certain political committees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-20 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1456 (Y: 122 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Amended RV#835 (Y: 107 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-20HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-19HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-19HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-19HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-19SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateAmended
2017-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed as amended
2017-05-04HouseAmended
2017-05-04HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-04HousePostponed
2017-05-04HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-03HousePostponed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-03HouseReferred to General Investigating & Ethics
2017-04-03HouseRead first time
2017-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback