TX HB39 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of certain time limitations on the award of grants by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas Oversight Committee.
Title
Relating to the repeal of certain time limitations on the award of grants by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas Oversight Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#455 (Y: 114 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 2nd time RV#426 (Y: 125 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#455 (Y: 114 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 2nd time RV#426 (Y: 125 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | House | Record vote RV#455 |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#426 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB438 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Subjects
CANCER PREVENTION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF TEXAS
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions