TX HB39 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the repeal of certain time limitations on the award of grants by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas Oversight Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the repeal of certain time limitations on the award of grants by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas Oversight Committee.

Sponsors

Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]
Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Gina Calanni [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]
Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]
Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]
Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]
Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]
Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]
Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]
Sen. Jane Nelson [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#455 (Y: 114 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 2nd time RV#426 (Y: 125 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Effective immediately
2019-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Administration
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#455
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#426
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-11HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB438 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback