TX SB438 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of certain time limitations on the award of grants by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas Oversight Committee.
Title
Relating to the repeal of certain time limitations on the award of grants by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas Oversight Committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB39 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
CANCER PREVENTION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF TEXAS
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions