TX HB39 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision of child protective services and other health and human services by certain state agencies; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision of child protective services and other health and human services by certain state agencies; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - House - Amended RV#1152 (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1127 (Y: 120 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1126 (Y: 57 N: 79 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment as amended fails of adoption RV#1125 (Y: 54 N: 79 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption RV#1124 (Y: 44 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#1123 (Y: 74 N: 58 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment to amendment tabled RV#1119 (Y: 74 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#621 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-12SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-05-12SenateRead first time
2017-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-12HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-11HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HousePassed as amended
2017-05-11HouseAmended
2017-05-11HouseAmended
2017-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10HouseRecord vote
2017-05-10HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10HouseRecord vote
2017-05-10HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10HouseRecord vote
2017-05-10HouseAmendment as amended fails of adoption
2017-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10HouseRecord vote
2017-05-10HouseAmendment to amendment fails of adoption
2017-05-10HouseAmendment amended
2017-05-10HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-10HouseAmendment adopted as amended
2017-05-10HouseAmendment amended
2017-05-10HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-10HouseAmendment adopted as amended
2017-05-10HouseAmendment amended
2017-05-10HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10HouseRecord vote
2017-05-10HouseAmendment adopted as amended
2017-05-10HouseAmendment amended
2017-05-10HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-10HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-10HousePostponed
2017-05-10HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-10HouseAmendment to amendment withdrawn
2017-05-10HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10HouseRecord vote
2017-05-10HouseAmendment to amendment tabled
2017-05-10HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment)
2017-05-10HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment)
2017-05-10HouseAmendment to amendment offered
2017-05-10HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-10HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-10HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HouseCalendars Committee rule adopted
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Emergency Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to Human Services
2017-03-15HouseRead first time
2017-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB39
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00039I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00039H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00039E.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB39&RcdVtNo=621&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB39&RcdVtNo=1119&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB39&RcdVtNo=1123&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB39&RcdVtNo=1124&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB39&RcdVtNo=1125&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB39&RcdVtNo=1126&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB39&RcdVtNo=1127&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB39&RcdVtNo=1152&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2017

Bill Comments 750

feedback