TX HB3895 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the application for and loans from the Texas military value revolving loan account.
Title
Relating to the application for and loans from the Texas military value revolving loan account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--General
LOANS
Military & Veterans
MILITARY PREPAREDNESS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Open Meetings
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--General
LOANS
Military & Veterans
MILITARY PREPAREDNESS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Open Meetings
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous