TX HB3889 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the cost for certain public school students of a broadband Internet access program offered by the Texas Education Agency.
Title
Relating to the cost for certain public school students of a broadband Internet access program offered by the Texas Education Agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1172 (Y: 104 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1172 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |