TX HB3880 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a student's eligibility for special education services provided by a school district, including services for dyslexia and related disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a student's eligibility for special education services provided by a school district, including services for dyslexia and related disorders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1111 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Amended RV#1082 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse requests conference committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenatePassed
2021-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Paxton
2021-05-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-26SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Education
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1111
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1082
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-13HouseAmended 1-Dutton
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-28HousePosting rule suspended
2021-04-27HouseNo action taken in committee
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-13HouseNo action taken in committee
2021-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-03-24HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1694 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3880
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03880I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03880H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03880E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03880S.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03880H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03880S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03880I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03880H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03880H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03880E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03880E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03880S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03880S.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3880&RcdVtNo=1082&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3880&RcdVtNo=1111&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=85

Bill Comments

feedback