TX SB1694 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a student's eligibility for special education services provided by a school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a student's eligibility for special education services provided by a school district.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-27SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-26SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3880 (Same As) 2021-05-28 - House appoints conferees-reported

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback