TX HB3862 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of money in the motorcycle education fund account for certain motorcycle safety programs.
Title
Relating to the use of money in the motorcycle education fund account for certain motorcycle safety programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-07 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-29 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-27 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-04-28 | House | Subcommittee meeting cancelled |
2015-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Long-term Infrastructure Planning by chair |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
MOTORCYCLES
Safety
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
MOTORCYCLES
Safety
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration