TX HB3822 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the calculation of the ad valorem taxes imposed on property for the year in which the property is acquired by a governmental entity.
Title
Relating to the calculation of the ad valorem taxes imposed on property for the year in which the property is acquired by a governmental entity.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2083 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Property Interests--General
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Property Interests--General
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3822 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03822I.htm |