TX HB3817 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedure for conducting surveys of public land, including the requirements regarding field notes and coordinate systems.
Title
Relating to the procedure for conducting surveys of public land, including the requirements regarding field notes and coordinate systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#582 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1072 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
SPATIAL REFERENCE CENTER AT TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
SPATIAL REFERENCE CENTER AT TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY--CORPUS CHRISTI, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
SPATIAL REFERENCE CENTER AT TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
SPATIAL REFERENCE CENTER AT TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY--CORPUS CHRISTI, TEXAS