TX HB3807 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of lifeguards and informational signs to improve safety on public beaches.
Title
Relating to the use of lifeguards and informational signs to improve safety on public beaches.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1631 (Y: 137 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#332 (Y: 125 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#332 (Y: 125 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1631 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-20 | House | Record vote RV#332 |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-19 | House | Amended 2-Hunter, Bonnen, and Middleton |
2021-04-19 | House | Amended 1-Hunter |
2021-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Coastal Affairs & Beaches
County Government
County Government--General
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Water Safety
Safety
SIGNS
City Government--General
Coastal Affairs & Beaches
County Government
County Government--General
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Water Safety
Safety
SIGNS